Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Zanke, Brent Walter (CPSO#: 60582)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 335
101 College Street
Toronto ON  M6R 1L3
Phone: (647) 287-8070
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brent W. Zanke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Zanke ( CPSO# 60582 )

Business Address:
335 - 101 College Street
Toronto ON  M6R 1L3
Phone Number: (647) 287-8070

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 07 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENT WALTER ZANKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZANKE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2002