Zare Parsi, Mojgan (CPSO#: 56180)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Mental Health Clinic
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6655
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
Branson Division
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.Oshidari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zare Parsi ( CPSO# 56180 )
Dr. A. Oshidari ( CPSO# 64671 )

Business Address:
Lyndhurst Hospital
520 Sutherland Drive
Toronto ON  M4G 3V9
Phone Number: (905) 881-0264


Corporation Name: M. Zare Parsi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zare Parsi ( CPSO# 56180 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Mental Health Clinic
4001 Leslie Street
Willowdale ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (905) 881-0264

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOJGAN ZARE PARSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZARE PARSI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1987