Zarifa, Gihane W (CPSO#: 74814)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Family Health Team
Family Medicine Teaching Unit
Suite 101
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 813-3850
Fax: (905) 813-3851
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-2200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Zarifa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Zarifa ( CPSO# 74814 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (416) 578-1690

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GIHANE W ZARIFA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZARIFA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2002