Zayouna, Maher Nafea (CPSO#: 94820)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Feb 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Division of Internal Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 300
871 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8X 2C9
Canada
Phone: (519) 252-8800
Fax: (519) 252-8803
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maher Zayouna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zayouna ( CPSO# 94820 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Division of Internal Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
300 - 871 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8X 2C9
Phone Number: (519) 252-8800

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Feb 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Dec 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Sep 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Maher  Nafea  Zayouna  may  practise  medicine  independently  in internal
            medicine, only.