Zeglinski, Joy Ann (CPSO#: 61374)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Sep 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Anxiety and Trauma Clinic
Billings Bridge Plaza
Suite 202
2277 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7X6
Phone: (613) 737-1194 Ext. 227
Fax: (613) 737-5884
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joy A. Zeglinski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zeglinski ( CPSO# 61374 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Anxiety and Trauma Clinic
Billings Bridge Plaza
2277 Riverside Drive
Suite 202
Ottawa ON  K1H 7X6
Phone Number: (613) 737-1194

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Dec 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOY ANN ZEGLINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZEGLINSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 14 Feb 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 15 Feb 2000 to 14 Feb 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 15 Feb 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 15 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 06 Sep 2005 to 05 Sep 2006
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 06 Sep 2006 to 11 May 2007
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1991