Zeldin, Robert Allan (CPSO#: 29961)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
825 Coxwell Ave.
Michael Garron Hospital
Chest Centre (G2)
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-0109
Fax: (416) 469-7714
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Allan Zeldin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Zeldin ( CPSO# 29961 )
Dr. D. Zeldin ( CPSO# 97361 )

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-0109

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 501-3565

Business Address:
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 27 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT ALLAN ZELDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZELDIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1978