Zelt, David Terence (CPSO#: 53825)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Victory 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2573
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.T. Zelt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Zelt ( CPSO# 53825 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Victory 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2573

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID TERENCE ZELT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZELT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Transplantation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Transplantation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1985