Zeng, Wanzhen (CPSO#: 72669)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Calgary, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nuclear Medicine
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-3446
Fax: (613) 761-4041
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Nuclear Medicine
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-4842
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-4842
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wanzhen Zeng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Zeng ( CPSO# 72669 )

Business Address:
Nuclear Medicine
Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
F 129
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-3446

Business Address:
Nuclear Medicine
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-5000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WANZHEN ZENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003