Zettel, Lenore Annette (CPSO#: 68929)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
Room D-2
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone: (905) 309-5335
Fax: (905) 309-6996
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lenore Zettel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Zettel ( CPSO# 68929 )

Business Address:
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
D2
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone Number: (905) 309-5335

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LENORE ANNETTE ZETTEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZETTEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2000