Zhao, Charles (CPSO#: 80209)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Sep 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greenbelt FHT
3500 Fallowfield Rd.
Unit 1C
Nepean ON  K2J 4A7
Phone: 613 843 1718
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

211 Lake Ave. E.
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Canada
Phone: (613) 257-2200
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zhao Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Zhao ( CPSO# 80209 )

Business Address:
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Phone Number: (613) 257-2200

Business Address:
Greenbelt FHT
Unit 1C
3500 Fallowfield Road
Nepean ON  K2J 4A7
Phone Number: (613) 843-1718

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Sep 2003 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES ZHAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2003 to 21 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2003