Zhou, Ji (CPSO#: 99362)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Tongji Medical University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
450 Blanche St
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Phone: (519) 882-4325
Fax: (519) 882-3711
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ji Zhou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zhou ( CPSO# 99362 )

Business Address:
450 Blanche Street
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Phone Number: (519) 882-4325

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JI ZHOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHOU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 22 Oct 2012 to 13 Jan 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 14 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 21 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 19 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 20 Oct 2014 to 05 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2015