Zhou, Yanying (CPSO#: 90759)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH
250 College St - Room 1116
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 30874
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zhou & Toews Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Toews ( CPSO# 88466 )
Dr. Y. Zhou ( CPSO# 90759 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
Room 7G-116, Glendale Wing
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6486

Business Address:
1116 - 250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YANYING ZHOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHOU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2015