Zimmermann, Camilla Cora Ulrica (CPSO#: 70518)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
Suite 16 - 712
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Fax: (416) 946-2866
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Camilla Zimmermann Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Zimmermann ( CPSO# 70518 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Suite 16-712
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAMILLA CORA ULRICA ZIMMERMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZIMMERMANN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1997