Zou, Limai (CPSO#: 73922)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
701 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2Z3
Phone: (416) 913-6130
Fax: (647) 435-6730
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Scarborough Hospital
Grace Division
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Limai Zou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Zou ( CPSO# 73922 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
701 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2Z3
Phone Number: (416) 913-6130

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIMAI ZOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001