Zufelt, Kirk William (CPSO#: 67007)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Group Health Centre
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 759-1234
Fax: (705) 541-2231
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bonder ( CPSO# 90576 )
Dr. K. Zufelt ( CPSO# 67007 )
Dr. P. Zehr ( CPSO# 59997 )
Dr. G. Yee ( CPSO# 70560 )
Dr. R. Wytsma ( CPSO# 52032 )
Dr. K. Taylor ( CPSO# 75094 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 72520 )
Dr. B. Slagel ( CPSO# 79472 )
Dr. C. Rossi ( CPSO# 51523 )
Dr. J. Reich ( CPSO# 73103 )
Dr. M. Mogharrabi ( CPSO# 57473 )
Dr. B. Mitchell ( CPSO# 59931 )
Dr. D. Micomonaco ( CPSO# 80815 )
Dr. M. Mathew ( CPSO# 44024 )
Dr. M. Leahy ( CPSO# 57088 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 62320 )
Dr. J. Lane ( CPSO# 61549 )
Dr. C. Kobelka ( CPSO# 62567 )
Dr. M. Keating ( CPSO# 57489 )
Dr. M. Hackett ( CPSO# 33820 )
Dr. H. Gupta ( CPSO# 78301 )
Dr. R. Gieni ( CPSO# 67230 )
Dr. D. Fritz ( CPSO# 60812 )
Dr. S. Fratesi ( CPSO# 27368 )
Dr. D. Fera ( CPSO# 33299 )
Dr. A. Fam ( CPSO# 62586 )
Dr. M. Edwards ( CPSO# 52889 )
Dr. S. Allen ( CPSO# 73014 )
Dr. E. Barrett ( CPSO# 56931 )
Dr. D. Beck ( CPSO# 50245 )
Dr. E. Beduhn ( CPSO# 26647 )
Dr. S. Bondar ( CPSO# 59698 )
Dr. P. Bragaglia ( CPSO# 33769 )
Dr. C. Bruni ( CPSO# 55651 )
Dr. D. Brooks ( CPSO# 26921 )
Dr. S. Buehner ( CPSO# 65582 )
Dr. D. Burrows ( CPSO# 50233 )
Dr. P. Catania ( CPSO# 31907 )
Dr. P. Ciaschini ( CPSO# 52948 )
Dr. M. Hemy ( CPSO# 86777 )
Dr. J. Keuhl ( CPSO# 88070 )
Dr. K. Opryszczko ( CPSO# 89989 )
Dr. E. Hirvi ( CPSO# 84322 )
Dr. C. Kuntz ( CPSO# 84476 )
Dr. A. Schamp ( CPSO# 82979 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 91088 )
Dr. J. Bishop ( CPSO# 96910 )
Dr. W. Chung ( CPSO# 99567 )
Dr. R. Tull ( CPSO# 93890 )
Dr. W. Wallace ( CPSO# 92960 )
Dr. M. Jenkins ( CPSO# 99889 )

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
170 East Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 549-5540

Business Address:
974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C2
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540


Corporation Name: Zufelt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Zufelt ( CPSO# 67007 )

Business Address:
Group Health Centre
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-1234

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIRK WILLIAM ZUFELT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZUFELT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 08 May 1998
Resident 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1997