Zysman, Michele Anne (CPSO#: 86701)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 216
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 498-9331
Fax: (416) 498-3114
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dufferin Vaughan Medical Clinic
9200 Dufferin Streeet, Unit #2
Concord, ON
L4K 0C6
Maple ON  L6A 4P9
Canada
Phone: 905-417-3125
Fax: 905-417-3105
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

4700 Keele St.
York University
North York ON  M3J 1P3
Canada
Phone: 647-722-2370
Fax: 416-367-4301
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELE ANNE ZYSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZYSMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 04 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010