de Rezende-Neto, Joao Baptista (CPSO#: 99828)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 30 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Division of General Surgery
Donnelly Wing Room (Suite) 3-074
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5284
Fax: 416-864-5281
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ahmed Marshall Lawless Rizoli de Rezende-Neto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rizoli ( CPSO# 64858 )
Dr. J. Marshall ( CPSO# 30263 )
Dr. B. Lawless ( CPSO# 68749 )
Dr. N. Ahmed ( CPSO# 73094 )
Dr. J. de Rezende-Neto ( CPSO# 99828 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
3-073 Donnelly Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5481


Corporation Name: Joao B. de Rezende-Neto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. de Rezende-Neto ( CPSO# 99828 )

Business Address:
St Michaels Hospital
Division of General Hospital
Suite 3-074, Donnelly Wing Room
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5284

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Brazil

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 19 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOAO BAPTISTA DE REZENDE-NETO may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the THE UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO in which Dr. DE REZENDE-NETO holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. DE REZENDE-NETO may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. DE REZENDE-NETO no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. DE REZENDE-NETO no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. DE REZENDE-NETO no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2015