de Waal, Tonya Reatta (CPSO#: 72277)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Sep 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tonya de Waal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. de Waal ( CPSO# 72277 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Aug 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TONYA REATTA DE WAAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE WAAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1999 to 31 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2000 to 31 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2001 to 31 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2002 to 31 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2003