van Schaik, Charmaine Simone (CPSO#: 69410)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Mar 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

712 Davis Drive, Suite 203
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8C3
Canada
Phone: 905-853-0600
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

30 Prospect Street, Suite 200
Newmarket AB  L3Y 3S9
Canada
Phone: 905-235-7284
Fax: 905-235-7320
County: 
Electoral District: 
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charmaine van Schaik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. van Schaik ( CPSO# 69410 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Suite 203
712 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8C3
Phone Number: (905) 853-0600

Business Address:
Suite 302
1 Quarry Ridge Raod
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 719-6788

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 29 Feb 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARMAINE SIMONE VAN SCHAIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN SCHAIK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Mar 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2000