Arvinte, Andrei (CPSO#: 85349)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 684-7271
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arvinte Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Arvinte ( CPSO# 85350 )
Dr. A. Arvinte ( CPSO# 85349 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 684-7271

Business Address:
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 732-6111

Business Address:
541 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 3A1
Phone Number: (905) 685-1381

Business Address:
403 Ontario Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 1L5
Phone Number: (905) 984-8766

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 08 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREI ARVINTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARVINTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 15 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 20 Jul 2007
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2007