First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Sep 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Feb 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |