First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Aug 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2000 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Jun 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Nov 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Apr 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Apr 2008 |