Aarts, Mary-Anne Wilhelmina (CPSO#: 72374)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
650 Sammon Avenue
Suite K401
Toronto ON  M4C 5M5
Phone: (416) 461-8363
Fax: (416) 461-8466
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

825 Coxwell Ave, East York
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: 416-461-8272
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mary-Anne Aarts Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zurowski ( CPSO# 72533 )
Dr. M. Aarts ( CPSO# 72374 )

Business Address:
UHN - Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-2581

Business Address:
301 - 40 Holly Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 486-8088

Business Address:
F108 - 825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: (416) 461-8363

Business Address:
650 Sammon Avenue
Suite K401
Toronto ON  M4C 5M5
Phone Number: (416) 461-8363

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY-ANNE WILHELMINA AARTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AARTS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2006