Abbott, Laura Lea (CPSO#: 65340)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
23 Main Street South
Waterford ON  N0E 1Y0
Phone: (519) 443-6694
Fax: (519) 443-6829
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Laura Abbott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Abbott ( CPSO# 65340 )

Business Address:
23 Main Street South
Waterford ON  N0E 1Y0
Phone Number: (519) 443-6694

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA LEA ABBOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABBOTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993