Abdallah, Faraj Wahib (CPSO#: 90886)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of Beirut, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Department of Anesthesiology
and Pain Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: 613-737-8899 Ext. 71887
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street, Room 1-026 Shuter
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: 416-864-5071
Fax: 416-864-6014
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. F. Abdallah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Abdallah ( CPSO# 90886 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa
Department of Anesthesiology and Pain Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
St Michaels Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
University of Toronto
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6520

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jul 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 17 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 18 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Faraj Wahib Abdallah may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Anesthesia,  University  of  Ottawa, in which Dr. Abdallah holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor;
                  
                  (ii)  as an associate staff member at  St. Michael's Hospital, University
                        of Toronto; and 
                  
                  (iii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment. 
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  when Dr. Abdallah
                  no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.