Abdel Malek, Gihan Fouad Kamel (CPSO#: 86844)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West London Family Health Org
Westmount Mall
785 Wonderland Road South 2nd Floor
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone: (519) 641-6712
Fax: (519) 641-6189
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elgamal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Elgamal ( CPSO# 69779 )
Dr. G. Abdel Malek ( CPSO# 86844 )

Business Address:
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
395 Carrie Street
Suite 318B
Strathroy ON  N7G 3C9
Phone Number: (519) 245-8392

Business Address:
200 - 785 Wonderland Road
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone Number: (519) 641-6712

Business Address:
1824 Concession Drive
Newbury ON  N0L 1Z0
Phone Number: (519) 693-4441


Corporation Name: Dixon Cunningham-Dunlop Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cunningham-Dunlop ( CPSO# 103184)
Dr. D. Martyniak ( CPSO# 93596 )
Dr. B. Yemchuk ( CPSO# 51884 )
Dr. D. Dixon ( CPSO# 65384 )
Dr. G. Abdel Malek ( CPSO# 86844 )
Dr. H. Youssef ( CPSO# 102376)
Dr. F. Sargolzaei ( CPSO# 93341 )
Dr. Y. Li ( CPSO# 95285 )
Dr. B. Choudhary ( CPSO# 96892 )
Dr. J. Zhu ( CPSO# 96742 )

Business Address:
West London Family Health Clinic
Unit 200
785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone Number: (519) 641-6712

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GIHAN FOUAD KAMEL ABDEL MALEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL MALEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2010