Abdel-Malek, Nada (CPSO#: 93539)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Sumac Creek Health Centre
3rd Floor
73 Regent Park Boulevard
Toronto ON  M5A 2B7
Phone: (416) 864-3022
Fax: (416) 864-6051
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Baycrest Centre
Apotex 6th Floor
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 785-2500 Ext. 2879
Fax: (416) 785-4221
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nada Abdel-Malek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Abdel-Malek ( CPSO# 93539 )

Business Address:
Baycrest Centre
Apotex 6th Floor
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone Number: (416) 785-2500

Business Address:
73 Regent Park Boulevard
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5A 2B7
Phone Number: (416) 864-3022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADA ABDEL-MALEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL-MALEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 01 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 02 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2011 to 30 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2012