Abdel-Mesih, Amal (CPSO#: 84579)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
Department Of Laboratory Medicine
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580
Fax: (416) 469-6359
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Antoine Eskander Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Abdel-Mesih ( CPSO# 84579 )
Dr. A. Eskander ( CPSO# 93322 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMAL ABDEL-MESIH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL-MESIH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011