Abdel-Qadir, Husam-Eldin Mohamed (CPSO#: 86702)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Cardiology Clinic
4th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-7723
Fax: (416) 323-6304
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Downsview Cardiology
6-906 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3H 2T5
Canada
Phone: (416) 633-0045
Fax: (416) 633-0048
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H.M. Abdel-Qadir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Abdel-Qadir ( CPSO# 86702 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
906 Sheppard Avenue West
Unit 6
Toronto ON  M3H 2T5

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Suite 310
Toronto ON  M5S 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 5C2
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 03 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUSAM-ELDIN MOHAMED ABDEL-QADIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL-QADIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011