Abdelhalim, Tarek (CPSO#: 95682)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of
General Internal Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: 4167566002
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto
ON
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: 4164806100 Ext. 4244
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tarek Abdelhalim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Abdelhalim ( CPSO# 95682 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of General Internal Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (647) 756-6002

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
8 East
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (647) 802-6243

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (647) 802-6243

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAREK ABDELHALIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDELHALIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015