Abdelshaheed, Tamer (CPSO#: 90761)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 100
2640 Rutherford Road
Vaughan ON  L4K 0H3
Canada
Phone: (905) 417-9600
Fax: (905) 553-3733
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

55 Frid Street
Hamilton ON  L8P 4M3
Canada
Phone: 9055292259
Fax: 9055292262
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

57 Major Mackenzie Drive East
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1G8
Canada
Phone: 9057806873
Fax: 9057806894
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tamer Abdelshaheed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Abdelshaheed ( CPSO# 90761 )

Business Address:
100 - 2640 Rutherford Road
Vaughan ON  L4K 0H3
Phone Number: (905) 417-9600

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
57 Major Mackenzie Drive East
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1G3

Business Address:
55 Frid Street
Hamilton ON  L8P 4M3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 21 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAMER ABDELSHAHEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDELSHAHEED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2013