Abdur-Rehman, Saleha (CPSO#: 96007)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Health Center
16 - 2555 Erin Center Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5M 5H1
Phone: 905-828-0270
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sandalwood Medical Center
Unit 1 170 Sandalwood Parkway East
Brampton ON  L6Z 1Y5
Canada
Phone: (905) 846-8282
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Abdur-Rehman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Abdur-Rehman ( CPSO# 96007 )

Business Address:
16 - 2555 Erin Center Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5M 5H1
Phone Number: (905) 828-0720

Business Address:
1-170 Sandlewood Parkway
Brampton ON  L6Z 1Y5
Phone Number: (905) 846-8282

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SALEHA ABDUR-REHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDUR-REHMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2013