Abiscott, Joshua Arthur (CPSO#: 73757)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1999

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Access Medical Centre
5-3098 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2B 7K2
Phone: (613) 596-9840
Fax: (613) 596-0496
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abiscott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Abiscott ( CPSO# 73757 )

Business Address:
Suite 5
3098 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2B 7K2
Phone Number: (613) 596-9840

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSHUA ARTHUR ABISCOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABISCOTT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1999

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 15, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)