Abo-El Ella, Shaimaa Mustafa Morsi (CPSO#: 88735)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 May 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles ST
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 345-4600
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

75 Charles St
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Canada
Phone: 613-345-4600
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shaimaa Abo-El Ella Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Abo-El Ella ( CPSO# 88735 )

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-4600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAIMAA MUSTAFA MORSI ABO-EL ELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABO-EL ELLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 12 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 13 Jan 2011 to 12 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 13 Jan 2012 to 12 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 13 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2014