Abouhassan, Tyceer (CPSO#: 82485)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101-2464 Howard Ave
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 915-6432
Fax: (519) 915-6083
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tyceer Abouhassan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Abouhassan ( CPSO# 82485 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 915-6432

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TYCEER ABOUHASSAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABOUHASSAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2010