Abramowitz, Daniel (CPSO#: 95146)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
205 - 3030 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 431-1242
Fax: (416) 431-0836
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Abramowitz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Abramowitz ( CPSO# 95146 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 431-1242

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL ABRAMOWITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABRAMOWITZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016