Abramson, Sydney Leonard (CPSO#: 65717)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Mar 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
142 Main Street East
North Bay ON  P1B 1A8
Phone: (705) 223-8225
Fax: (705) 223-4372
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

77 Front St
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2G9
Canada
Phone: (705) 753-5700
Fax: (705) 753-4600
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

The Oaks Centre
9 Oakland Blvd
Suite 1
Elliot Lake ON  P5A 2T1
Canada
Phone: (705) 461-7703
Fax: (705) 848-0996
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sydney Abramson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 3 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona
USA - Florida
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYDNEY LEONARD ABRAMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABRAMSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2009