Adams, Jeremy William (CPSO#: 88766)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
589 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 7L6
Phone: 905-935-4763
Fax: 905-646-3251
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines, ON
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: 905-978-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeremy Adams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Erdman ( CPSO# 103637)
Dr. J. Adams ( CPSO# 88766 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
589 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 7L6
Phone Number: (905) 646-2525

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEREMY WILLIAM ADAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012