Adams, John Richard (CPSO#: 72457)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ashgrove Medical Centre
Suite 109
6633 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone: (905) 294-8504
Fax: (905) 294-2552
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John R. Adams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Adams ( CPSO# 70110 )
Dr. J. Adams ( CPSO# 72457 )

Business Address:
Suite 109
6633 Highway 7
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone Number: (905) 294-8504

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN RICHARD ADAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2005