Adcock, Lesley Elizabeth (CPSO#: 71185)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Health Team
Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 2W 404
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5888 Ext. 3
Fax: (416) 603-5448
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lesley Adcock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Adcock ( CPSO# 71185 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
399 Bathurst Street
Suite 2W 404
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLEY ELIZABETH ADCOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADCOCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1999