Adetola, Ejibunmi Olubusola (CPSO#: 81929)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:Olabisi Onabanjo University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Zoemed Clinic Regina
Suite 106
3A 1550 14th Ave
Regina SK  S4P 0W6
Phone: 306 525 3694
Fax: 306 525 3994
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. MJ Adetola Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Adetola ( CPSO# 81929 )
Dr. M. Adetola ( CPSO# 83658 )

Business Address:
St. Francis Memorial Hospital
7 St. Francis Memorial Drive
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Phone Number: (613) 756-3044

Business Address:
460 West Hunt Club Road
Suite 106
Ottawa ON  K2E 0B8
Phone Number: (613) 820-3694


Corporation Name: Dr. EO Adetola Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Adetola ( CPSO# 81929 )
Dr. M. Adetola ( CPSO# 83658 )

Business Address:
106 - 460 West Hunt Club Road
Nepean ON  K2E 0B8
Phone Number: (613) 820-3694

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EJIBUNMI OLUBUSOLA ADETOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADETOLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 18 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 Nov 2015
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2004