Adeyi, Oyedele Adewale (CPSO#: 84043)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Ibadan, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
Eaton Wing 11E-206
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3136
Fax: (416) 340-5517
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1100 Bennett Road
Bowmanville ON  L1C 3K5
Canada
Phone: (647) 405-4015
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adeyi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Adeyi ( CPSO# 84043 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Pathology
Eaton Wing 11E-206
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3136

Business Address:
1100 Bennett Road
Bowmanville ON  L1C 3K5

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nigeria

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 15 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OYEDELE ADEWALE ADEYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADEYI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Feb 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2007