Adil, Aliya (CPSO#: 81951)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Sind, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
A+Medical Centre & Walk-In
1079 Maple Ave
Milton ON  L9T 0A5
Phone: (905) 864-9008
Fax: (905) 864-9004
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Siddiqui and Dr. Aliya Adil Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Adil ( CPSO# 81951 )
Dr. A. Siddiqui ( CPSO# 99225 )

Business Address:
1079 Maple Avenue
Milton ON  L9T 0A5
Phone Number: (905) 864-9008

Business Address:
250 Wincott Drive
Suite 12
Etobicoke ON  M9R 2R5
Phone Number: (416) 249-0002

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Sep 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALIYA ADIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2004 to 22 Dec 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Dec 2004 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2005 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2006