Afshar-Ghotli, Zohreh (CPSO#: 85078)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Turkish

Education:Islamic Azad University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121 Ext. 2140
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Afshar-Ghotli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Afshar-Ghotli ( CPSO# 85078 )

Business Address:
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZOHREH AFSHAR-GHOTLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AFSHAR-GHOTLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010