Agoston, Hanga (CPSO#: 93583)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Connor House Family Practice
240 Pinnacle Street
Belleville ON  K8N 3A6
Phone: (613) 968-9840
Fax: (613) 968-5495
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hanga Agoston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Agoston ( CPSO# 93583 )

Business Address:
Connor House Family Practice
240 Pinnacle Street
Belleville ON  K8N 3A6
Phone Number: (613) 968-9840

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANGA AGOSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGOSTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012