Ahmad, Afzal (CPSO#: 25309)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Oct 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Oct 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Diagnostic Centre
3950 Grandpark Drive
Mississauga ON  L5C 2C4
Phone: 905 279 1144
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Afzal Ahmad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ahmad ( CPSO# 25309 )

Business Address:
3950 Grandpark Drive
Mississauga ON  L5B 2C4

Business Address:
Suite 102
71 King Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone Number: (905) 279-1144

Business Address:
Suite 104
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AFZAL AHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMAD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1972