Ahmed, Kashif Salaam (CPSO#: 93256)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4211
Fax: (519) 421-4263
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm St
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Canada
Phone: (519) 631-2020
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ahmed ( CPSO# 93256 )

Business Address:
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Business Address:
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Nov 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KASHIF SALAAM AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2013