Ahn, Eric (CPSO#: 90940)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
12-470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Phone: 905-790-6362
Fax: 905-790-6612
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eric Ahn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ahn ( CPSO# 90940 )

Business Address:
12 - 470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Phone Number: (905) 790-6362

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 06 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC AHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2013