Ahooja, Vineeta (CPSO#: 89907)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Jul 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 412
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone: (416) 281-9499
Fax: (416) 283-5705
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2nd Floor
235 Salem Road
Ajax ON  L1Z 0B1
Canada
Phone: (905) 426-8333
Fax: (905) 426-4447
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vineeta Ahooja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 31 2018


Corporation Name: Vineeta Ahooja Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ahooja ( CPSO# 89907 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Cardiology
412 - 1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone Number: (416) 281-9499

Business Address:
235 Salem Road
Suite E-5
Ajax ON  L1Z 0B1
Phone Number: (905) 426-8333

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Jul 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 17 Jul 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Sep 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Nov 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 18 Nov 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Nov 2010 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Vineeta Ahooja may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and
            cardiology, only.