Ahsan, Muhammad Rauf (CPSO#: 88665)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Dow Medical College, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Rauf Ahsan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ahsan ( CPSO# 88665 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Cardiac Surgery
30 Bond Street 8th Floor Bond Wing
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 22 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD RAUF AHSAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHSAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 11 Aug 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 12 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jun 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2013